## Introduction to Mathematics Tables

A mathematical table shows the results of multiplying two numbers. Multiplication is also known as repeated addition. To make it more clear that multiplication is a repeated addition or not, let's take an example. We know that 4 3 = 12 and when we add 4 three times i.e, 4 + 4 + 4 =12 (repeated addition) from this we say that multiplication is not but a repeated addition. Students need to memorize the multiplication table because it helps them to perform the multiplication table faster and also it helps the students to solve calculation problems easily.

## Multiplication Table of 125

Multiplication tables are easy to learn. In the same way 125 table is also easy to learn. The table of 125 is the multiplication table which shows the multiples of 125 with different whole numbers and this 125 table gives the factors 125.

## Below is 125 Table

## Deriving the Multiplication Table of 125

## Multiplication Table of 125 Up To 20 Times in Words

The 20 times multiplication table of 125 is written in the following way:

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times One gives us One Hundred And Twenty-Five.

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Two gives us Two Hundred And Fifty.

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Three gives us Three Hundred And Seventy-Five.

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Four gives us five Hundred.

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Five gives us Six Hundred And Twenty-Five.

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Six gives us Seven Hundred And Fifty

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Seven gives us Eight Hundred And Seventy-Five

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Eight gives us One Thousand

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Nine gives us One Thousand, One Hundred And Twenty-Five

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Ten gives us One Thousand, Two Hundred And Fifty.

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Eleven gives us One Thousand, Three Hundred And Seventy-Five.

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Twelve gives us One Thousand, Fifteen Hundred.

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Thirteen gives us One Thousand, Six Hundred And Twenty Five.

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Fourteen gives us One Thousand, Seven Hundred And Fifty.

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Fifteen gives us One Thousand, Eight Hundred And Seventy-Five.

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Sixteen gives us Two Thousands.

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Seventeen gives us Two Thousand, One Hundred And Twenty-Five.

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Eighteen gives us Two Thousand, Two Hundred And Fifty.

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Nineteen gives us Two Thousand, Three Hundred And Seventy-Five.

One Hundred And Twenty-Five times Twenties gives us Two Thousand, Five Hundred.

## How do You Multiply Any Two Digit Number With 125 in Two Seconds?

We can multiply any 2 digit number by 125 in seconds. Surprising right ! Let's see how ?

Here, we will apply a trick that has 2 steps.

Step 1: Divide the given number by 8.

Step 2: Now multiply the result obtained in step 1 by 1000 to get your answer.

Let us consider a few examples:

Problem 1: 64 x 125

Here, you notice that 64 is easily divisible by 8 so let us start with the trick now.

Step 1: Divide 64 by 8

Here, after dividing 64 by 8 we get the result as 8

Step 2: Add three zeros after the number you obtained, like here you got 8. Adding three zeros to right side of 8 gives us 8000

Answer: So, your answer is 8,000 on multiplying 64 with 125.

## Examples of 125 Times Table

Though 125 is a big number 125 Multiplication Table isn’t difficult as it seems, it can be understood in the simplest way:

The trick we will use here will be substituting 125 by $\dfrac{1000}{8}$, as $\dfrac{1000}{8}$ gives you 125.

Example 1: 22 x 125

Solution: So, $22 \times \dfrac{1000}{8}$ = $\dfrac{ 22,000}{8}$ which gives you 275.

Example 2: Another example of 6021 x 125:

Solution: So, 6021 x 125 = $6021 \times \dfrac{1000}{8}$ = $\dfrac {6021000}{8}$

On solving, we get 752625.

## Solved Examples

1. What is the cost of 6 notebooks , if each notebook costs Rs. 125?

Solution: The cost of one notebook = Rs. 125

Then, the cost of 6 notebooks = 6 ×125 = 750

Therefore, the cost of 6 notebooks is Rs.750.

2. What is the value of 7 125

Solution: From the multiplication table of 125 we know that 7 125 =875. We can also get the answer by doing the repeated addition i.,e 125+125+125+125+125+125+125 = 875.

3. A vendor sells vegetables to 125 customers per day. He can sell vegetables to many customers in 6 days?

Solution: Given that the vendor sells vegetables to 125 customers per day.

Therefore in 6 days vendor can sell vegetables to 750 members i.,e 125 6 = 750 members

### Practise Questions

1. What is the value of 125 125

15,625

17755

25255

25674

Ans: a

2. What is the value of 125 15

3189

1875

1200

1799

Ans: b

3. What is the value of 125 5

225

650

625

720

Ans: c

## Conclusion

In this article we have discussed the multiplication table of 125. The table of 125 helps you to solve multiplication and calculation with large numbers easily. Also, we have derived the 125 times table from the table of other numbers as we did with the 100 times table.

## FAQs on Table of 125 - Let’s Understand It

**1. A dealer purchases three sets of T.V. from the wholesale shop every day. How many T.V. sets will the dealer buy in 125 days?**

The dealer purchases three sets of T.V. every day. Therefore, using 125 times, the total number of T.V. sets bought by the dealer in 125 days is 3 × 125 = 375 T.Vs.

**2. Rima jogs 8 miles per day. Use the table of 125 to determine how many miles she jogged in 125 days.**

Rima jogs 8 miles every day. Therefore, the total miles traveled 8 × 125 = 1000 miles in 125 days.

**3. Arun earns 130 per day. How much money will she earn if she works for 125 days?**

Jenny earns 130 per day. Therefore, using the multiplication table of 125, the total money made by Jenny in 125 hours is 130 × 125 = 16,250.

**4. Find the value of x, if 125x=1625.**

Here we have to find out the x value

Given 125 x= 1625

x = $\dfrac{1625}{125}$

x =13.