Questions & Answers

Question

Answers

Answer

Verified

129k+ views

Let us start the solution to the above question by finding the result that the student got, i.e., 7236 multiplied by 65.

$ \text{Wrong result}=7236\times 65 $

Now, let us find the result that the student would have got if he multiplied 7236 by 56, i.e., the correct result. So, representing this mathematically gives:

$ \text{Correct result}=7236\times 56 $

Now, to find out how much is the wrong answer greater than the correct one, we will subtract the correct answer from the wrong one. On doing so, we get

$ \text{Wrong result}-\text{Correct result}=7236\times 65-7236\times 56 $

Now, we will take 7236 common to make the expression less complicated. On doing so, we get

$ \text{Wrong result}-\text{Correct result}=7236\left( 65-56 \right) $

$ \Rightarrow \text{Wrong result}-\text{Correct result}=7236\times 9=65124 $

Hence, we can conclude that the wrong result is greater than the wrong result by 65124.