Before I share 8 Vedic math tricks for rapid calculation, let me give you a brief idea on Vedic Maths so that you don’t have to check the internet anymore to get definitions of Vedic Math. And, these Vedic Math tricks are powerful enough to help you reduce your calculation time in JEE, CBSE/ICE Board exam or other competitive exams.

**What Is Meant By Vedic Mathematics?**

The term ‘Vedic’ came from a Sanskrit word ‘Veda’, that means ‘Knowledge’. And, Vedic Math is a super collection of sutras to solve math problems in a faster & easy way.

**What Are The Benefits Of Learning Vedic Mathematics?**

You can solve any difficult/ time-consuming**JEE** problem or ICSE/ CBSE Math immediately using Vedic Math Tricks. Moreover, just by using Vedic Math you can solve a problem mentally and that’s the beauty of Vedic Maths. While you encounter polynomial functions & quadratic sums in a higher class in CBSE or ICSE Board, knowledge of Vedic Math will lend a helping hand to beat the difficulty level of those sums.

**Who Is The Father Of Vedic Maths?**

Vedic mathematics simplifies arithmetic operations and these formulas & concepts have increasingly found acceptance across the world. Vedic Math- the ancient method of solving Mathematics problems was later discovered by Shankaracharya Bharti Krishna Tirthaji, who is known as the 'Father of Vedic Mathematics'.

In this blog, you will learn 8 Vedic Maths tricks that you can apply to solve your ICSE/ CBSE Math or JEE problems in less time with high accuracy. Once you master these Vedic Math tricks, you don’t need to depend on calculators for any big calculations. These Vedic Math Tricks prove to be really helpful to crack any competitive exams. So here are the 8 Vedic Math tricks that I was talking about:

__1. Squaring ____Of A Number Whose U____nit Digit Is 5__

The term ‘Vedic’ came from a Sanskrit word ‘Veda’, that means ‘Knowledge’. And, Vedic Math is a super collection of sutras to solve math problems in a faster & easy way.

You can solve any difficult/ time-consuming

Vedic mathematics simplifies arithmetic operations and these formulas & concepts have increasingly found acceptance across the world. Vedic Math- the ancient method of solving Mathematics problems was later discovered by Shankaracharya Bharti Krishna Tirthaji, who is known as the 'Father of Vedic Mathematics'.

In this blog, you will learn 8 Vedic Maths tricks that you can apply to solve your ICSE/ CBSE Math or JEE problems in less time with high accuracy. Once you master these Vedic Math tricks, you don’t need to depend on calculators for any big calculations. These Vedic Math Tricks prove to be really helpful to crack any competitive exams. So here are the 8 Vedic Math tricks that I was talking about:

With this Vedic Math trick, you can quickly find the square of a two-digit number ending with 5.

CBSE or ICSE-whatever syllabus you follow, you will definitely come across such sums.

For example Find (55) ² =?

Step 1. 55 x 55 = . . 25 (end terms)

Step 2. 5x (5+1) = 30

So our answer will be 3025.

Well, if you have understood the process try to find the square of 75 & 95.

__2. Multiply a Number By 5__

Generally, you come across such calculations in ICSE/ CBSE exams or homework or while thinking mentally (JEE, KVPY, Olympiad & lot more) to solve a Math problem. Next time use this trick to save your time.

Take any number, and depending on its even or odd nature, divide the number by 2 (get half of the number).

__Even Number:__

CBSE or ICSE-whatever syllabus you follow, you will definitely come across such sums.

For example Find (55) ² =?

Step 1. 55 x 55 = . . 25 (end terms)

Step 2. 5x (5+1) = 30

So our answer will be 3025.

Well, if you have understood the process try to find the square of 75 & 95.

Generally, you come across such calculations in ICSE/ CBSE exams or homework or while thinking mentally (JEE, KVPY, Olympiad & lot more) to solve a Math problem. Next time use this trick to save your time.

Take any number, and depending on its even or odd nature, divide the number by 2 (get half of the number).

2464 x 5 =?

Step 1. 2464 / 2 = 1232

Step 2. add 0

The answer will be 2464 x 5 = 12320

__Odd Number:__

Step 1. 2464 / 2 = 1232

Step 2. add 0

The answer will be 2464 x 5 = 12320

3775 x 5

Step 1. Odd number; so ( 3775 - 1) / 2 = 1887

Step 2. As it is an odd number, so instead of 0 we will put 5

The answer will be 3775 x 5 = 18875

**Time to check your knowledge:**

Now try —- 1234 x 5, 123 x 5

__3. Subtraction From 1000, 10000, 100000 __

Tell me, how much time will you take to subtract a number from 100’s multiple such as 1000, 1000, 10000? 1 min or less? Leave that, try to calculate with this new formula and think if it’s easy & reduce your calculation time or not!

For example:

1000 – 573 =? (Subtraction from 1000)

Step 1. Odd number; so ( 3775 - 1) / 2 = 1887

Step 2. As it is an odd number, so instead of 0 we will put 5

The answer will be 3775 x 5 = 18875

Now try —- 1234 x 5, 123 x 5

Tell me, how much time will you take to subtract a number from 100’s multiple such as 1000, 1000, 10000? 1 min or less? Leave that, try to calculate with this new formula and think if it’s easy & reduce your calculation time or not!

For example:

1000 – 573 =? (Subtraction from 1000)

We simply subtract each figure in 573 from 9 and then subtract the last figure from 10.

Step 1. 9 – 5 = 4

Step 2. 9 – 7 = 2

Step 3. 10 – 3 = 7

Step 1. 9 – 5 = 4

Step 2. 9 – 7 = 2

Step 3. 10 – 3 = 7

So, the answer is: (1000 – 573) = 427

Here are some practice sums for you. Try to solve these sums using the mentioned Vedic Math Tricks.

1000 – 857, 10,000 – 1029, 10,000 – 1264, 1000 – 336.

__4. Multiplication Of Any 2-digit Numbers (11 - 19)__

Till Math is there, you need to do such calculation each & every day, whether you are from__CBSE__ board or ICSE Board. This Vedic Trick is especially for getting the result when you multiply any two-digit number from 11 to 19.

Once you practice this Vedic Trick for a number of times, you might never need a calculator to get the result as you will calculate faster than the machine.

**There are 4 steps to get the result:**

Step 1. Add the unit digit of the smaller number to the larger number.

Step 2. Next, multiply the result by 10.

Step 3. Now, multiply the unit digits of both the 2-digit numbers.

Step 4. Then add both the numbers.

For example: Let’s take two numbers 13 & 15.

Step 1. 15 + 3 =18.

Step 2. 18*10 = 180.

Step 3. 3*5 = 15

Step 4. Add the two numbers, 180+15 and the answer is 195.

Hope you have understood this Vedic Math Trick. It might seem a bit complex at first, but trust me once you master it, your calculation speed will increase by at least 80%. And, that is something every student needs to score well in Math!

Using this Vedic Trick, solve these sums and share your result: 15*18, 11*13, 19*19

__5. Dividing ____A Lar____ge Number By 5__

Tell me, how do you generally divide a large digit number by 5? And, how much time do you take to solve such sums? Here is your challenge-

divide 2128 by 5. Before you start, start the timer.

Done in 2 secs? Ok! 4 secs? No? Well, next time divide the number using this Vedic Trick and note down the time taken to solve the sum.

So, what are the steps?

1st step. Multiply the number by 2

2nd step: Move the decimal point to left.

3rd step: Left side of the decimal point is your answer.

For example: 245 / 5 =?

Step 1. 245 * 2 = 490

Step 2. Move the decimal: 49.0 or just 49

Let’s try another: 2129 / 5

Step 1: 2129 * 2 = 4258

Step2: Move the decimal: 425.8 or just 425

Now you try to solve 16951/5, 2112/5, 4731/5

__6. ____Multiply Any Two-digit Number B____y 11__

Use this Vedic Math trick to complete multiplication sin just 2 seconds. So, let’s see how you can reduce your calculation using this Vedic Trick.

For example:

32 x 11

32 * 11 = 3 (3+2) 2 = 352

So, the answer is: 32 * 11 =352

Another Example:

52 x 11 = 5 (5+2) 2 = 572

Now try 35*11, 19*11, 18*11.

__7. ____Multiplication Of Any 3-digit Numb____ers__

Suppose you want to multiply these 2 numbers: 306 and 308

Step 1. Now subtract the unit place digit from the actual number.

308-8=300

306-6=300

Step 2. Now select any (1st or 2nd) number and add the unit digit of the other number

308+6=314

Step 3. Now we will multiply the product we got in step 2 and step 1; 314×300 = 94200

Step 4. Unit digits of both the numbers are 8 & 6. The product of these 2 numbers: 8×6=48

Step 5. Last step: 94200 + 48 = 94248

So our final answer 306 x 308 = 306 is 94248

Solve these sums using the same method and feel the difference- 808*206, 536*504, 408*416.

__8. ____Find The Square Va____lue__

Finding the square of a number in using Vedic Maths Trick is easy. Just follow the below steps:

Step 1.Choose a base closer to the original number.

Step 2. Find the difference of the number from the base.

Step 3. Add the difference with the original number.

Step 4. Multiply the result with the base.

Step 5. Add the product of the square of the difference with the result of the above point.

(99) ² =?

Step 1. Choose 100 as base

Step 2. Difference: 99-100 = -1

Step 3. Add the number with the difference that you got in Step 2 = 99 + (-1) = 98

Step 4. Multiplying result with base = 98*100 = 9800

Step 5. Now, add result with the square of the difference= 9800 + (-1)² = 9801

So our answer is : (99) ² = 9801

For your practice: (98)², (97)², (102)², (101)².

If you check any competitive exam paper, you will find a lot of Math problems that can be solved easily & quickly using these Vedic Math Tricks. Not only for competitive exams like Olympiad, KVPY, JEE but also you can use these Vedic Math tricks in your regular school studies to increase speed & accuracy.

Practice a lot. At first, you might find these tricks a bit complex or not easy, but once you practice these tricks will do a wonderful job when you start your calculation. Leave your comment and let us know if you have found these tricks to be helpful or not!

You can follow us on social media for more such amazing posts or drop us a mail for your feedback!

Here are some practice sums for you. Try to solve these sums using the mentioned Vedic Math Tricks.

1000 – 857, 10,000 – 1029, 10,000 – 1264, 1000 – 336.

Till Math is there, you need to do such calculation each & every day, whether you are from

Once you practice this Vedic Trick for a number of times, you might never need a calculator to get the result as you will calculate faster than the machine.

Step 1. Add the unit digit of the smaller number to the larger number.

Step 2. Next, multiply the result by 10.

Step 3. Now, multiply the unit digits of both the 2-digit numbers.

Step 4. Then add both the numbers.

For example: Let’s take two numbers 13 & 15.

Step 1. 15 + 3 =18.

Step 2. 18*10 = 180.

Step 3. 3*5 = 15

Step 4. Add the two numbers, 180+15 and the answer is 195.

Hope you have understood this Vedic Math Trick. It might seem a bit complex at first, but trust me once you master it, your calculation speed will increase by at least 80%. And, that is something every student needs to score well in Math!

Using this Vedic Trick, solve these sums and share your result: 15*18, 11*13, 19*19

Tell me, how do you generally divide a large digit number by 5? And, how much time do you take to solve such sums? Here is your challenge-

divide 2128 by 5. Before you start, start the timer.

Done in 2 secs? Ok! 4 secs? No? Well, next time divide the number using this Vedic Trick and note down the time taken to solve the sum.

So, what are the steps?

1st step. Multiply the number by 2

2nd step: Move the decimal point to left.

3rd step: Left side of the decimal point is your answer.

For example: 245 / 5 =?

Step 1. 245 * 2 = 490

Step 2. Move the decimal: 49.0 or just 49

Let’s try another: 2129 / 5

Step 1: 2129 * 2 = 4258

Step2: Move the decimal: 425.8 or just 425

Now you try to solve 16951/5, 2112/5, 4731/5

Use this Vedic Math trick to complete multiplication sin just 2 seconds. So, let’s see how you can reduce your calculation using this Vedic Trick.

For example:

32 x 11

32 * 11 = 3 (3+2) 2 = 352

So, the answer is: 32 * 11 =352

Another Example:

52 x 11 = 5 (5+2) 2 = 572

Now try 35*11, 19*11, 18*11.

Suppose you want to multiply these 2 numbers: 306 and 308

Step 1. Now subtract the unit place digit from the actual number.

308-8=300

306-6=300

Step 2. Now select any (1st or 2nd) number and add the unit digit of the other number

308+6=314

Step 3. Now we will multiply the product we got in step 2 and step 1; 314×300 = 94200

Step 4. Unit digits of both the numbers are 8 & 6. The product of these 2 numbers: 8×6=48

Step 5. Last step: 94200 + 48 = 94248

So our final answer 306 x 308 = 306 is 94248

Solve these sums using the same method and feel the difference- 808*206, 536*504, 408*416.

Finding the square of a number in using Vedic Maths Trick is easy. Just follow the below steps:

Step 1.Choose a base closer to the original number.

Step 2. Find the difference of the number from the base.

Step 3. Add the difference with the original number.

Step 4. Multiply the result with the base.

Step 5. Add the product of the square of the difference with the result of the above point.

(99) ² =?

Step 1. Choose 100 as base

Step 2. Difference: 99-100 = -1

Step 3. Add the number with the difference that you got in Step 2 = 99 + (-1) = 98

Step 4. Multiplying result with base = 98*100 = 9800

Step 5. Now, add result with the square of the difference= 9800 + (-1)² = 9801

So our answer is : (99) ² = 9801

For your practice: (98)², (97)², (102)², (101)².

If you check any competitive exam paper, you will find a lot of Math problems that can be solved easily & quickly using these Vedic Math Tricks. Not only for competitive exams like Olympiad, KVPY, JEE but also you can use these Vedic Math tricks in your regular school studies to increase speed & accuracy.

Practice a lot. At first, you might find these tricks a bit complex or not easy, but once you practice these tricks will do a wonderful job when you start your calculation. Leave your comment and let us know if you have found these tricks to be helpful or not!

You can follow us on social media for more such amazing posts or drop us a mail for your feedback!